MA H754 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4780
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to oversight of long-term care by the Department of Public Health. Elder Affairs.
Title
Providing the Department of Public Health with adequate oversight of long-term care facilities
Sponsors
Rep. David Robertson [D] | Rep. Tami Gouveia [D] | Rep. Sally Kerans [D] | Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D] |
Rep. Joan Meschino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4780 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 16, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S1281 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S412 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S406 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
H2281 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5197
S1482 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S413 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
H4780 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H735 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Accompanied S412
S412 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S406 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
H2281 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5197
S1482 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S413 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
H4780 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H735 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Accompanied S412
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H754 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H754.pdf |