MA H817 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5026
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to campaign vendors. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to campaign vendors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5026 |
2021-09-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S881 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S654 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
H2815 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2585 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2845 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2677 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2199 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S112 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S470 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5307
H5026 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1489 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S654 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
H2815 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2585 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2845 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2677 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2199 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S112 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S470 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5307
H5026 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1489 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H817 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H817.pdf |