MA H827 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4431
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4431
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4431
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the illumination of locations under the control of the Division of Urban Parks and Recreation. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to sidewalk safety
Sponsors
Rep. Martha Walz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-28 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4431 |
2013-11-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/04/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4431 (Replaced by) 2014-08-28 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H827 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H827.pdf |