MA H977 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3803
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3803
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3803
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to workers’ pathways to self sufficiency. [Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities].
Title
TO IMPROVE THE EDUCATIONAL REWARDS GRANT PROGRAM TO ASSIST LOW INCOME WORKERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-10 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3803 |
2011-04-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/11/2011 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-04-13 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H3803 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H977 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12837&generalCourtId=1 |