MA S1159 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1897
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to fairness in worker’s compensation disfigurement benefits. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to fairness in workers' compensation disfigurement benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-09-28 | Senate | Accompanied by H1880 and H1897 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1159 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1159.pdf |