MA S1165 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Accompanied H1927
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Accompanied H1927
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect injured workers. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To protect injured workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | House | Accompanied H1927 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1927 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1165 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1165.pdf |