MA S1203 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2406
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - New draft substituted, see S2406
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - New draft substituted, see S2406
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to gender neutral redraft of the town charter of Ipswich. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to gender neutral redraft of the town charter of Ipswich
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2406 |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Read third |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Accompanied by S1202 and S2269 |
2019-07-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H1818 (Similar To) 2019-09-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2019
S1192 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2019
S1202 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied S1203
H3822 (Similar To) 2019-10-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2019
H3903 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
S2264 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Amended (DiZoglio) by substituting a new draft, see S2626
S2269 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied S1203
H3938 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5008
H3954 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H3961 (Similar To) 2020-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 153 of the Acts of 2019
H3969 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2020
H3985 (Similar To) 2019-12-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2019
H4036 (Similar To) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 310 of the Acts of 2020
S2406 (Replaced by) 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2019
H4222 (Similar To) 2020-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2020
S1192 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2019
S1202 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied S1203
H3822 (Similar To) 2019-10-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2019
H3903 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
S2264 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Amended (DiZoglio) by substituting a new draft, see S2626
S2269 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied S1203
H3938 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5008
H3954 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H3961 (Similar To) 2020-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 153 of the Acts of 2019
H3969 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2020
H3985 (Similar To) 2019-12-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2019
H4036 (Similar To) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 310 of the Acts of 2020
S2406 (Replaced by) 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2019
H4222 (Similar To) 2020-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1203 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1203.pdf |