MA S1208 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the Commission on Falls Prevention. Public Health.
Title
Further regulating the Commission on Falls Prevention
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-05-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-05-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-04-30 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2017-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1173 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1289 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1727 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2616
S1757 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1861 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H263 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S160 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S164 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S752 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H608 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H1182 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H25 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
S2149 (Similar To) -
S2344 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2373
H4962 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Resolve passed and laid before the Governor
S1289 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1727 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2616
S1757 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1861 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H263 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S160 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S164 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S752 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H608 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H1182 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H25 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
S2149 (Similar To) -
S2344 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2373
H4962 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Resolve passed and laid before the Governor
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1208 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1208.pdf |