MA S1283 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure the constitutional rights and human dignity of prisoners on mental health watch. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
To ensure the constitutional rights and human dignity of prisoners on mental health watch
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 9, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/28/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H2089 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4948
H3689 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1613 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1578 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2969
H2256 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5198
S2404 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1564 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1638 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2967
H4948 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1445 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - New draft substituted, see S2730
H3689 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1613 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1578 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2969
H2256 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5198
S2404 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1564 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1638 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2967
H4948 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1445 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - New draft substituted, see S2730
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1283 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1283.pdf |