MA S1390 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the restoration to service for certain retirees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to restoration to service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 05/31/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-05-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1474 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1400 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1447 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1450 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H2522 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2526 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2529 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2062 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2485
H1331 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H739 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2165 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1460 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H31 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H33 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4146 (Similar To) 2018-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 280 of the Acts of 2018
S2648 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2666 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 360 of the Acts of 2018
H4967 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 379 of the Acts of 2018
H4977 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2018
S1400 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1447 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1450 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H2522 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2526 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2529 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2062 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2485
H1331 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H739 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2165 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1460 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H31 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H33 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4146 (Similar To) 2018-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 280 of the Acts of 2018
S2648 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2666 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 360 of the Acts of 2018
H4967 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 379 of the Acts of 2018
H4977 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1390 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1390.pdf |