MA S1482 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2545
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Massachusetts Water Resources Authority. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the Massachusetts Water Resources Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2545 |
2019-04-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H1532 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S375 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
H748 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - New draft substituted, see H4844
S1478 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied H2177
S1479 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1480 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1481 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied H2176
H3852 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2019
S2263 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
S375 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
H748 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - New draft substituted, see H4844
S1478 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied H2177
S1479 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1480 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1481 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied H2176
H3852 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2019
S2263 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1482 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1482.pdf |