MA S1510 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2270
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2270
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the definition of podiatry. Public Health.
Title
Relative to the definition of podiatry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | Accompanied H2270 |
2022-02-22 | House | House concurred |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2270 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S201 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S201 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1510 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1510.pdf |