MA S1648 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2610
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to responsible corporate investments. Public Service.
Title
Relative to responsible corporate investments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2610 |
2023-06-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2434 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
H3693 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4039 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2610 (Replaced by) 2024-04-22 - Reported (in part) by S1614
H4414 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - Rejected
H4446 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - Adopted
H3693 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4039 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2610 (Replaced by) 2024-04-22 - Reported (in part) by S1614
H4414 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - Rejected
H4446 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - Adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1648 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1648.pdf |