MA S1857 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 146 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 146 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act extending the Environmental Joint Powers Agreement that created the A-B-C Stormwater Flooding Board The committee on Ethics and Rules, to whom was referred the Senate Bill extending the Environmental Joint Powers Agreement that created the A-B-C Stormwater Flooding Board (Senate, No, 343), reports that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session and recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 1857).
Title
Extending the Environmental Joint Powers Agreement that created the A-B-C Stormwater Flooding Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-22 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 146 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-11-18 | House | Enacted |
2013-11-14 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-10-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-09-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-09-05 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Substituted for S343 |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S343 |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1857 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1857.pdf |