MA S1859 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2498
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to further regulating the Energy Facilities Siting Board within the Department of Public Utilities. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to the Energy Facilities Siting Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2498 |
2017-10-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2017 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1827 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1847 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H1779 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H2917 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4277
H460 (Similar To) 2017-12-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
H3566 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4527
H3567 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4527
H1774 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1778 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1762 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1732 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H3391 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S2498 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1847 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H1779 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H2917 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4277
H460 (Similar To) 2017-12-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
H3566 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4527
H3567 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4527
H1774 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1778 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1762 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1732 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H3391 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S2498 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1859 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1859.pdf |