MA S1877 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2848
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-28 - New draft substituted (Lewis), see S2848
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-28 - New draft substituted (Lewis), see S2848
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for the creation of a special commission relative to the seal and motto of the Commonwealth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Resolve providing for the creation of a special commission relative to the seal and motto of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-28 | Senate | New draft substituted (Lewis), see S2848 |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Adverse report rejected |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Accompanied by H2776 |
2019-11-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H729 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2478 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1439 (Similar To) 2020-05-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1248 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
H560 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2052 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S43 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2723
H3524 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H2776 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied S1877
S2848 (Replaced by) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Resolves of 2020
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2478 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1439 (Similar To) 2020-05-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1248 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
H560 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2052 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S43 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2723
H3524 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H2776 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied S1877
S2848 (Replaced by) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Resolves of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1877 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1877.pdf |