MA S2032 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the appointment of a certain civil service class as firefighters in the city of Boston
Title
Relative to the appointment of a certain civil service class as firefighters in the city of Boston.
Sponsors
Sen. John Hart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-04 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2009 | |
2009-11-30 | Enacted | |
2009-11-30 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2009-11-25 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2009-11-18 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-11-17 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2009-11-16 | Read; and referred to the committee on House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-11-13 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2009-11-13 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | |
2009-10-15 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-09-28 | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | |
2009-04-21 | House concurred | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/Senate/S2032 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=6996&generalCourtId=2 |