MA S2055 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Charles Maynard, an employee of the Department of Developmental Services. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Charles Maynard, an employee of the Department of Developmental Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-12-15 | House | Enacted |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-12-15 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-12-12 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-12-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-12-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-12-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-12-05 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-12-01 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-12-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-12-01 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2011-11-17 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-11-09 | House | House concurred |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2055 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17477&generalCourtId=1 |