MA S2069 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2399
Note: Legislation replaced by S2589
Note: Legislation replaced by S2589
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-05 - New draft substituted, see S2589
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-05 - New draft substituted, see S2589
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for recall elections in the town of Uxbridge. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Providing for recall elections in the town of Uxbridge
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Kuros [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2589 |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read third |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Read |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Rules from a part of S2399 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2399 |
2017-10-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-05-22 | House | House concurred |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S402 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2399 (Replaced by) 2018-04-09 - Reported (in part) by S2069
S2589 (Replaced by) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 359 of the Acts of 2018
S2399 (Replaced by) 2018-04-09 - Reported (in part) by S2069
S2589 (Replaced by) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 359 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2069 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2069.pdf |