MA S2190 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2202
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on October 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-08 - New draft substituted, see S2202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-08 - New draft substituted, see S2202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Furthering health empowerment and affordability by leveraging transformative health care.
Title
Furthering health empowerment and affordability by leveraging transformative health care.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-08 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2202 |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Read second |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, November 8, 2017 |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment,substituting therefor a new draft, see S2202 |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Reported from the special Senate committee on Health Care Cost Containment and Reform |
Same As/Similar To
S2202 (Replaced by) 2017-11-09 - Reprinted as amended, see S2211
H1181 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2322 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1149 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3295 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2165 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H491 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H1181 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2322 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1149 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3295 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2165 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H491 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2190 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2190.pdf |