MA S2338 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - New draft substituted, see S2515
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - New draft substituted, see S2515
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an Organ Donation Registration Fund
Title
Establishing an Organ Donation Registration Fund
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | New draft substituted, see S2515 | |
2010-06-23 | Read second | |
2010-06-23 | Rules suspended | |
2010-06-23 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S2515 | |
2010-05-03 | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-04-01 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | |
2010-04-01 | New draft of S833 and S897 | |
2010-04-01 | Reported from the committee on Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S833 (Replaces) 2010-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2338
S897 (Replaces) 2010-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2338
S2515 (Replaced by) 2010-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 190 of the Acts of 2010
S897 (Replaces) 2010-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2338
S2515 (Replaced by) 2010-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 190 of the Acts of 2010
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/Senate/S2338 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8432&generalCourtId=2 |