MA S2406 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to gender neutral redraft of the town charter of Ipswich (Senate, No. 1203).
Title
Amending the charter of the town of Ipswich to make it gender neutral and to further regulate town operations
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2019 | |
2019-12-26 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-12-26 | House | Enacted |
2019-12-23 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-11-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-11-18 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Substituted for S1203 |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Recommended new draft (Tarr) for S1203 |
Same As/Similar To
S1202 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied S1203
S1203 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - New draft substituted, see S2406
H1818 (Similar To) 2019-09-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2019
S1192 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2019
H4036 (Similar To) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 310 of the Acts of 2020
H4222 (Similar To) 2020-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2020
S1203 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - New draft substituted, see S2406
H1818 (Similar To) 2019-09-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2019
S1192 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2019
H4036 (Similar To) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 310 of the Acts of 2020
H4222 (Similar To) 2020-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2406 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2406.pdf |