MA S2530 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2713
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2713
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2713
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize citizens in the town of Brookline who have reached the age of sixteen years or older to register and vote in municipal election with the town. Election Laws. [Local approval received.]
Title
Authorizing citizens in the town of Brookline who have reached the age of sixteen years or older to register and vote in municipal election with the town
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2713 |
2021-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-16 | House | House concurred |
2021-09-13 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H4067 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3935 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2022
S2473 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3951 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Text of amendment, see H3903
S2043 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S527 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1160 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1159 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S464 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S2049 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S1331 (Similar To) 2021-12-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2980 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H1000 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S2199 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2194 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S485 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S448 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S1332 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S2713 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H825 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H828 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S465 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H3935 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2022
S2473 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3951 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Text of amendment, see H3903
S2043 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S527 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1160 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1159 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S464 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S2049 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S1331 (Similar To) 2021-12-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2980 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H1000 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S2199 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2194 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S485 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S448 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S1332 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S2713 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H825 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H828 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S465 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2530 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2530.pdf |