MA S386 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2755
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to ensuring the integrity of charter schools. Education.
Title
Ensuring charter school integrity
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2755 |
2021-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2473 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3708 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Report accepted, in concurrence
S2484 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H4085 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4943
H4110 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2538 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2758
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2233 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S1613 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2755 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3708 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Report accepted, in concurrence
S2484 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H4085 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4943
H4110 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2538 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2758
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2233 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S1613 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2755 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S386 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S386.pdf |