MA S395 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2116
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act to support the infiltration/inflow financial assistance program By Mr. Petruccelli, a petition of Anthony W. Petruccelli that the Commonwealth be required to reimburse the Water Resources Authority for certain grants and loans made for sewer service improvements. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To support the infiltration/inflow financial assistance program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2116 |
2013-11-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/04/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S2116 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S395 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S395.pdf |