MA S57 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2345
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide financial assistance for funeral and burial expenses of the deceased to those in need. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To provide financial assistance for funeral and burial expenses of the deceased to those in need
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2345 |
2017-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:30 PM in B-2 |
2017-04-21 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2017-04-14 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 04/25/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-04-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/25/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S709 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S677 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S680 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2247
H1930 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H117 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3490 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S2345 (Replaced by) 2018-04-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S677 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S680 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2247
H1930 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H117 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3490 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S2345 (Replaced by) 2018-04-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S57 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S57.pdf |