MA S591 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2296
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - New draft substituted, see S2296
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - New draft substituted, see S2296
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect access to confidential healthcare. Financial Services.
Title
To protect access to confidential healthcare
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2296 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read second |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 14, 2018 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S2296 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Accompanied by H2960 |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in 222 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S951 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1773 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2982 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2960 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Accompanied S591
S2296 (Replaced by) 2018-03-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2018
S1773 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2982 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2960 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Accompanied S591
S2296 (Replaced by) 2018-03-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S591 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S591.pdf |