MA S598 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prevent homelessness among elderly and disabled persons and families facing no-fault evictions. Housing.
Title
To prevent homelessness among elderly and disabled persons and families facing no-fault evictions
Sponsors
Sen. John Hart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Housing |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S598 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S598.pdf |