MA S780 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1293
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to accountable care. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to accountable care
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Accompanied by H1293 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-08-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S671 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1284 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S189 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S2492 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H4109 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - Accompanied S2492
S813 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S926 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S1603 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2766
S795 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1491 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3173
S1304 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
H1293 (Replaces) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S780
S1279 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S806 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1284 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S189 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S2492 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H4109 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - Accompanied S2492
S813 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S926 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S1603 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2766
S795 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1491 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3173
S1304 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
H1293 (Replaces) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S780
S1279 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S806 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S780 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S780.pdf |