MI HB5604 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-06 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-06 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education; teachers; approval of teacher preparation institution that does not offer a student teaching experience that includes multiple settings, student populations, and use of local school district's evaluation tool; prohibit. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1538d.
Title
Education; teachers; approval of teacher preparation institution that does not offer a student teaching experience that includes multiple settings, student populations, and use of local school district's evaluation tool; prohibit. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1538d.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 685 (Y: 88 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2018-12-05 | House | Transmitted |
2018-12-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 685 Yeas 88 Nays 20 |
2018-12-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-05 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-05 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted And Amended |
2018-12-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-03-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/20/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Education Reform |
2018-02-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Pamela Hornberger |