MI SB0108 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on September 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-09 - Assigned Pa 0108'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on September 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-09 - Assigned Pa 0108'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Libraries; district; district library establishment act; modify. Amends sec. 2 of 1989 PA 24 (MCL 397.172).
Title
Libraries; district; district library establishment act; modify. Amends sec. 2 of 1989 PA 24 (MCL 397.172).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 251 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 38 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 38 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-09 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0108'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/30/2015 @ 1:44 Pm |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/30/2015 @ 9:15 Am |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/23/2015 @ 2:32 Pm |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2015-06-16 | House | Returned To Senate |
2015-06-16 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2015-06-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 251 Yeas 109 Nays 1 |
2015-06-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-06-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-06-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-06-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-06-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2015-03-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-03-05 | House | Received On 03/05/2015 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 38 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Dale Zorn |