MO HB1767 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the provisions regarding Internet cyber crime law enforcement task forces and the Cyber Crime Investigation Fund from June 5, 2012, to August 28, 2022
Title
Extends the provisions regarding Internet cyber crime law enforcement task forces and the Cyber Crime Investigation Fund from June 5, 2012, to August 28, 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Allen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-29 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety (H) | |
2012-02-20 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-17 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1767&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1767I.htm |