MO HB2364 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Placed Back on Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Placed Back on Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to intoxicating liquor
Title
Modifies provisions relating to intoxicating liquor
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Bondon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Placed Back on Perfection Calendar |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-03-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-15 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2018-02-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-02-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |