NH HB1136 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the fish and game department to grant awards for solutions to reducing the Asian shore crab and European green crab populations.
Title
Authorizing the fish and game department to grant awards for solutions to reducing the Asian shore crab and European green crab populations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 33 |
2016-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 20 |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2016-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2016 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building304 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 4 P. 3 |