NH HB1474 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 225-80 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 225-80 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the collection of data relative to firearm related deaths and injuries.
Title
Requiring the collection of data relative to firearm related deaths and injuries.
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Rogers [D] | Rep. Cynthia Chase [D] | Rep. Wayne Burton [D] | Rep. Paul Berch [D] |
Rep. Skip Berrien [D] | Rep. Deanna Rollo [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - ITL (Y: 225 N: 80 NV: 55 Abs: 37) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 225-80 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 81 |
2016-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass House Calendar 14 P. 85 |
2016-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 11-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 85 |
2016-03-01 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/02/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-03-01 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/01/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-02-02 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/19/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-02-02 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/15/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-01-07 | House | Vacated and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety (Rep. A. Christie): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 18 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 4 P. 15 |