NH HB1568 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 181-148 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 181-148 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting town employees and elected officials from profiting from businesses with which the town does business.
Title
Prohibiting town employees and elected officials from profiting from businesses with which the town does business.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Roy [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - ITL (Y: 181 N: 148 NV: 15 Abs: 52) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 181-148 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 17 |
2020-01-29 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2020-01-24 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/13/2020 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 6 |
2020-01-14 | House | Executive Session: 01/22/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/14/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 27 |