NH HB1621 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 171-103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 171-103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Redefining simple assault.
Title
Redefining simple assault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - ITL (Y: 171 N: 103 NV: 32 Abs: 84) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 171-103 |
2014-02-21 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2014-02-21 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 9-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 13 |
2014-02-05 | House | Continued Executive Session: 2/11/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 2/04/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 =RECESSED= |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-12-20 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |