NH HB587 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to indicating citizenship or legal residency on drivers' licenses and nondrivers' identification cards.
Title
Relative to indicating citizenship or legal residency on drivers' licenses and nondrivers' identification cards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-03-24 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 86 |
2021-03-05 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2021 11:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link: To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99182085994 |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98796113084 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 55 |