NJ A2682 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2665
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Gusciora)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Gusciora)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends health benefits coverage of a newborn infant.
Title
Extends health benefits coverage of a newborn infant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Gusciora) |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2682 (Carry Over) 2014-06-16 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Gusciora)
S947 (Same As) 2014-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S947 (Same As) 2014-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee