NJ S1611 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3139
Note: Carry Over of previous A4508
Note: Carry Over of previous A4508
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns radon testing in certain schools and institutions of higher education.
Title
Concerns radon testing in certain schools and institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3139 (Carry Over) 2022-10-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4508 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A4315 (Same As) 2024-05-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee
A4508 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A4315 (Same As) 2024-05-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S1611 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2000/1611_I1.HTM |