NJ S1857 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S367
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-10 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-10 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes measures to deter steroid use among students; appropriates $45,000 to DOE for New Jersey State Interscholastic Athletic Association testing of student-athletes for steroids and other performance enhancing substances.*
Title
Establishes measures to deter steroid use among students; appropriates $45,000 to DOE for New Jersey State Interscholastic Athletic Association testing of student-athletes for steroids and other performance enhancing substances.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2699 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2699 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2699 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2699 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-10 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Substituted for A2699 (1R) |
2014-10-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1857 (Carry Over) 2015-08-10 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A2699 (Same As) 2015-03-26 - Substituted by S1857 (1R)
A2699 (Same As) 2015-03-26 - Substituted by S1857 (1R)