NJ S2015 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-25 - Substituted by A2949
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-25 - Substituted by A2949
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes State Treasurer to sell surplus property, known as Plainfield Armory, located in City of Plainfield in Union County.
Title
Authorizes State Treasurer to sell surplus property, known as Plainfield Armory, located in City of Plainfield in Union County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-25 | Senate | Substituted by A2949 |
2012-10-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2949 (Same As) 2012-12-03 - Approved P.L.2012, c.77.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S2015 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S2500/2015_I1.HTM |