NJ S367 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1857
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Substituted by A2353
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Substituted by A2353
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes measures to deter steroid use among students; appropriates $45,000 to DOE for New Jersey State Interscholastic Athletic Association testing of student-athletes for steroids and other performance enhancing substances.
Title
Establishes measures to deter steroid use among students; appropriates $45,000 to DOE for New Jersey State Interscholastic Athletic Association testing of student-athletes for steroids and other performance enhancing substances.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | Substituted by A2353 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1857 (Carry Over) 2015-08-10 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A2353 (Same As) 2017-05-11 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
A2353 (Same As) 2017-05-11 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/S367 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/S0500/367_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S367 |