NY A02205 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to educating children on the harms of electronically sending and posting certain images of themselves.
Title
Relates to educating children on the harms of electronically sending and posting certain images of themselves.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-05-25 | Assembly | print number 2205a |
2011-05-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2011-01-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S03439 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES