NY A04069 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "people first act of 2013"; defines terms; ensures that individuals with developmental disabilities who utilize long-term care services under the medical assistance program administered by the state have meaningful access to a reasonable array of community-based and institutional program options to ensure the well-being of such individuals.
Title
Enacts the "people first act of 2013"; defines terms; ensures that individuals with developmental disabilities who utilize long-term care services under the medical assistance program administered by the state have meaningful access to a reasonable array of community-based and institutional program options to ensure the well-being of such individuals.
Sponsors
Asm. Dennis Gabryszak [D] | Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Raymond Walter [R] | Asm. Didi Barrett [D] |
Asm. Jane Corwin [R] | Asm. John Ceretto [R] | Asm. John McDonald [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-15 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | print number 4069b |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | print number 4069a |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to mental health |
2013-01-30 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S01109 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8452