NY A06451 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - print number 6451a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - print number 6451a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates additional penalties for failure to comply with traffic-control indications, including a temporary suspension of a vehicle's registration for repeat violations and an additional surcharge for repeat violations.
Title
Creates additional penalties for failure to comply with traffic-control indications, including a temporary suspension of a vehicle's registration for repeat violations and an additional surcharge for repeat violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Assembly | print number 6451a |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07985 (Same As) 2018-03-16 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION