NY A09964 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - advanced to third reading cal.817
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - advanced to third reading cal.817
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting the sale of child products containing organohalogen flame retardant.
Title
Relates to prohibiting the sale of child products containing organohalogen flame retardant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.817 |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-03-02 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S08227 (Same As) 2018-04-19 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION