NY S06639 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6896A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6896A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the collection of certain demographic information by certain state agencies, boards, departments and commissions.
Title
Requires the collection of certain demographic information by certain state agencies, boards, departments and commissions.
Sponsors
Sen. Julia Salazar [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] |
Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6896A |
2021-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1793 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6639A |
2021-06-03 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06896 (Same As) 2021-12-22 - approval memo.109