OK SR1 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-9)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-9)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution; Alcohol and substance abuse; declaring April 18, 2015 as Drug-Endangered Children's Day in the State of Oklahoma.
Title
Resolution; Alcohol and substance abuse; declaring April 18, 2015 as Drug-Endangered Children's Day in the State of Oklahoma.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2015-04-16 | Senate | coauthored by all other Senators |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Considered |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sr1&Session=1600 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SRES/SR1%20INT.PDF |