PA HB2049 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 118
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 118
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for requirements for documentation of the need for an assistance animal or service animal in housing and for the offenses of misrepresentation of entitlement to assistance animal or service animal and misrepresentation of animal as assistance animal or service animal.
Title
Providing for requirements for documentation of the need for an assistance animal or service animal in housing and for the offenses of misrepresentation of entitlement to assistance animal or service animal and misrepresentation of animal as assistance animal or service animal.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Mark Keller [R] | Rep. Bernie O'Neill [R] |
Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Greg Rothman [R] | Rep. David Zimmerman [R] | Rep. Katharine Watson [R] |
Rep. Bryan Barbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2049 PN 3127, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 2049 PN 3127, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A05805 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A05776 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 2049 PN 3127, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A05805 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A05776 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | Senate | Act No. 118 |
2018-10-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-1) |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |
2018-04-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2018-04-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-03-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-03-14 | House | Second consideration |
2018-03-13 | House | Removed from table |
2018-03-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-03-12 | House | First consideration |
2018-03-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |